This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 03:34:06 (UTC).

AZAR MOHEBI, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SHAHROUZ MOJALLALI VS FH & HF-TORRANCE I, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 AZAR MOHEBI, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SHAHROUZ MOJALLALI filed an Other lawsuit against FH HF-TORRANCE I, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4601

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHEBI BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SHAHROUZ MOJALLALI AZAR

Defendants

FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION

FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

GARCIA STEPHEN M.

FEUSNER JODIE COHEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUBSTITUTE DECEDENT'S SUCC...)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUBSTITUTE DECEDENT'S SUCC...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Dismissal

5/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

5/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO SUBSTITUTE THE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AS PLAINTIFF

5/21/2021: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO SUBSTITUTE THE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AS PLAINTIFF

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIMIN MOJALLALI

5/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIMIN MOJALLALI

Case Management Statement

5/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUBSTITUTE DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AS PLAINTIFF

5/13/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUBSTITUTE DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AS PLAINTIFF

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER

5/19/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIMON MOJALLALI

2/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIMON MOJALLALI

Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH AND ABATEMENT OF CASE

1/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH AND ABATEMENT OF CASE

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF RULING ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

12/8/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF RULING ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/25/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/30/2020

11/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Complaint

11/19/2020: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:50 AM in Department 16; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Simin Mojallali); Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMotion re: (to Substitute the Successor in Interest as Plaintiff); Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO SUBSTITUTE DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AS PLAINTIFF) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SUBSTITUTE DECEDENT'S SUCC...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (NOTICE OF RULING ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE); Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 4:18 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Azar); Filed by Azar Mohebi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUSNER, JODIE C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL