This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 08:26:30 (UTC).

AZAHR ALUQDAH VS KANNESHA ANN MULLINAX, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 AZAHR ALUQDAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KANNESHA ANN MULLINAX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2625

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALUQDAH AZAHR

Defendants

ARAKELYAN EDUARD

MULLINAX KANNESHA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LUCERO LINDA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/22/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

1/22/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Azahr Aluqdah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Azahr Aluqdah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Azahr Aluqdah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA