This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 08:47:19 (UTC).

AZADUHY KHATCHATURIAN, ET AL. VS CITY OF GLENDALE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 AZADUHY KHATCHATURIAN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1106

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KACHATURIAN VAHAG

KHATCHATURIAN AZADUHY

Defendants

CITY OF GLENDALE

COLUMBUS APARTMENTS LLC

SILBER MOSHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

KANG EDWARD B

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/27/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/27/2022: Complaint

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/4/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/15/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

2/15/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/17/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 04/07/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: City of Glendale (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: City of Glendale (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Personal Service: As To Parties changed from City of Glendale (Defendant) to City of Glendale (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 04/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Azaduhy Khatchaturian (Plaintiff); Vahag Kachaturian (Plaintiff); As to: City of Glendale (Defendant); Columbus Apartments, LLC (Defendant); Moshe Silber (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Azaduhy Khatchaturian (Plaintiff); Vahag Kachaturian (Plaintiff); As to: City of Glendale (Defendant); Columbus Apartments, LLC (Defendant); Moshe Silber (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Azaduhy Khatchaturian (Plaintiff); Vahag Kachaturian (Plaintiff); As to: City of Glendale (Defendant); Columbus Apartments, LLC (Defendant); Moshe Silber (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less