Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 12:24:28 (UTC).

AYUS & CO, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 AYUS CO, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8771

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYUS & CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HARTFORD FIRE NSURANCE COMPANY A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLTON ANDREW C

Defendant Attorney

KELLAM NEWTON W

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE

4/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE

Case Management Statement

4/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE); Filed by AYUS & CO, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); HARTFORD FIRE NSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant); UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AYUS & CO, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HARTFORD FIRE NSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant); UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AYUS & CO, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AYUS & CO, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AYUS & CO, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLTON ANDREW C