This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 00:29:50 (UTC).

AYUMI HAMASAKI VS TYSON BODKIN

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 AYUMI HAMASAKI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TYSON BODKIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TAMZARIAN, ARMEN and ZUKIN, HELEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7066

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TAMZARIAN, ARMEN

ZUKIN, HELEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAMASAKI AYUMI

Respondent

BODKIN TYSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GINSBERG LARRY ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 84, Zukin, Helen, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Request of Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 84, Zukin, Helen, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Request of Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice (Change of Firm Name ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Bodkin, Tyson - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-16 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-18-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice - Rejection (Re: POS )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (SERVER SIGNATURE NOT ORIGINAL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hamasaki, Ayumi ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 05-11-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hamasaki, Ayumi ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.