This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 13:39:23 (UTC).

AYSOVA, LUIZA VS RAFIQ, FAYCAL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 AYSOVA, LUIZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAFIQ, FAYCAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6558

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AYSOVA LUIZA

Respondent

RAFIQ FAYCAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/16/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/15/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons - Summons

6/15/2022: Summons - Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/15/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

6/15/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F