This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 02:31:23 (UTC).

AYSHA ANSARI ET AL VS RICE ASSOCIATES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by AYSHA ANSARI against RICE ASSOCIATES INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9075

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ANSARI MAHAMMED

ANSARI AYSHA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1-20

WOODLAND HILLS ATHLETIC CLUB

RICE ASSOCIATES INC.

HOUSEHOLDER TOM

 

Court Documents

Opposition

10/10/2018: Opposition

Reply

10/19/2018: Reply

Reply

10/19/2018: Reply

Reply

11/19/2018: Reply

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

Notice

11/27/2018: Notice

Association of Attorney

12/27/2018: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Separate Statement

5/9/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration

5/9/2019: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/9/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Protective Order

6/19/2019: Motion for Protective Order

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/3/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/3/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/3/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration

7/16/2019: Declaration

Reply

11/19/2018: Reply

Answer

11/27/2018: Answer

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Reply (in Support of Their Motions to Compel Responses and Deem RFA's Admitted); Filed by Aysha Ansari (Plaintiff); Mahammed Ansari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Opposition (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses); Filed by Rice Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Tom Householder (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Rachel Robledo in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response); Filed by Rice Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Tom Householder (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Proof of Service re: Motion to Compel Responses; Filed by Aysha Ansari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing Date of Motion for Summary Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing Date of Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Aysha Ansari (Plaintiff); Mahammed Ansari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing Date of M...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Opposition (Defendants' Opposition to Exparte); Filed by Woodland Hills Athletic Club (Legacy Party); Tom Householder (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • Demurrer; Filed by Rice Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Woodland Hills Athletic Club (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Rice Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Woodland Hills Athletic Club (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DEFENDANT RICE ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA WOODLAND HILLS ATHLETIC CLUB'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOSHUA SHAYNE, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DEFENDANT RICE ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA WOODLAND HILLS ATHLETIC CLUB'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name) Doe 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Aysha Ansari (Plaintiff); Mahammed Ansari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Aysha Ansari (Plaintiff); Mahammed Ansari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699075    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AYSHA ANSARI, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

RICE ASSOCIATES, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC699075

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 14, 2019

Plaintiffs filed these motions to compel further responses on 10/04/19, setting them for hearing on 10/31/19.  On 10/17/19, the parties participated in an informal discovery conference.  At the conclusion of the conference, the Court noted that the issues were “mostly resolved” and continued the hearing on the motions to 11/14/19. 

To date, no party has filed any additional briefing or evidence concerning the status of the motions to compel.  The Court is hopeful that the parties have resolved all outstanding issues.  If all issues have been resolved, the Court asks Plaintiffs to take this motion off calendar promptly.

To the extent issues remain unresolved, the Court continues the hearing from 11/14/19 to 12/06/19.  On or before Wednesday, 11/27/19, the parties must file a joint statement of items in dispute.  The joint statement must be ONE document, jointly submitted by the moving and opposing parties, and must include each discovery item that remains in dispute, the most current response concerning that item, and each party’s discussion of why a further response remains or does not remain at issue.  If the parties seek sanctions, they must brief their requests for sanctions in the same format.  A conformed courtesy copy of the statement must be provided directly to Department 3. 

Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.