This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 02:59:51 (UTC).

AYON, MARLYN VS ORTIZ, JORGE RICHARD

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 AYON, MARLYN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ORTIZ, JORGE RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1397

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AYON MARLYN

Respondent

ORTIZ JORGE RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOLDSTEIN CARY W.

 

Court Documents

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

2/8/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/8/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

2/8/2021: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

2/8/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

2/11/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/11/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN CARY W.