This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 05:08:28 (UTC).

AYLA ERDOS STEINBERG VS TRENDING ALL DAY LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 AYLA ERDOS STEINBERG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TRENDING ALL DAY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4444

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ERDOS-STEINBERG AYLA

Defendants and Respondents

DELAINE HAYLEY

DOES 1 TO 40

KALLENBERG DAVID

ASTI ANTONIO

TRENDING ALL DAY LLC

MILLEDGE KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SILVERSTEIN DOUGLAS N. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COSTELL JEFFREY LEE ESQ.

ROBERTS JR. REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

3/16/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RULING RE ATTORNEYS REGINALD ROBERTS, JR. AND JASON ZIVEN'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TRENDING ALL DAY LLC

2/3/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RULING RE ATTORNEYS REGINALD ROBERTS, JR. AND JASON ZIVEN'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TRENDING ALL DAY LLC

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT TRENDING ALL DAYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

2/7/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT TRENDING ALL DAYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

2/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/4/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/23/2020

1/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/23/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/24/2020

1/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Notice of Ruling

1/24/2020: Notice of Ruling

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/16/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Substitution of Attorney

12/3/2019: Substitution of Attorney

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

7/13/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Proposed Judgment); Filed by Ayla Erdos-Steinberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Judgment) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Default of Scheduled Settlement Payment); Filed by Ayla Erdos-Steinberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Trending All Day LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Ayla Erdos-Steinberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ayla Erdos-Steinberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ayla Erdos-Steinberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ayla Erdos-Steinberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. SEX BASED HARASSMENT IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704444    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains to Attorneys Reginald Roberts, Jr. and Jason Ziven of the firm Sanders Roberts LLP, counsel for Defendant Trading All Day, LLC. The motion complies with the above requirements save the requirement that a motion to be relieved include a prepared order form, form MC-053.

Attorneys Reginald Roberts, Jr. and Jason Ziven’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant Trending All Day LLC will be DENIED unless the attorneys present the court with a completed MC-053 proposed order form.