Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 22:36:41 (UTC).

AYDE SEGURA VS CJ FOODS SERVICE HOLDINGS USA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 AYDE SEGURA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CJ FOODS SERVICE HOLDINGS USA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3483

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEGURA AYDE

Defendants

CJ FOODS SERVICE HOLDINGS USA LLC

BARON HR LLC

CJ FOODS MANUFACTURING BEAUMONT CORPORATION

CJ FOODS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION

BARONHR WEST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIBIYAN DAVID D.

AVILES DIEGO F.

Defendant Attorneys

WELCH ERIC MICHAEL

GIAMELA LONNIE DOMONIC

PARK SOOYOUNG

PARK BRIAN DAE SHIN

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

11/6/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ALICIA RENEE DESMOND, CSR #13037

9/24/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ALICIA RENEE DESMOND, CSR #13037

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF JULIO MARIO MEDAL

9/18/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF JULIO MARIO MEDAL

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF AYDE SEGURA

9/18/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF AYDE SEGURA

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF EVELYNN PEREZ

9/18/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF EVELYNN PEREZ

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVELYNN PEREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVELYNN PEREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRUCE TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRUCE TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT - JOINT INITIAL

7/8/2019: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT - JOINT INITIAL

Notice of Appearance

6/11/2019: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

6/11/2019: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/18/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • Hearing04/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Notice of Related Case); Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Notice of Related Case); Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Notice of Related Case); Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 10:17 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of 10/22/19 Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDefendant CJ Foods Manufacturing Corporation, CJ Foods Service Holdings USA, LLC, and CJ Foods Manufacturing Beaumont Corporation's Status Conference Statement; Filed by CJ Foods Service Holdings USA, LLC (Defendant); CJ Foods Manufacturing Corporation (Defendant); CJ Foods Manufacturing Beaumont Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketJoint Further Status Conference Statement; Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:04 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/29/2019 and Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ayde Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CJ FOODS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION-DOE 1 is a litigant

Latest cases where BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Baron HR, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aviles, Diego