This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 01:36:17 (UTC).

AYANKA EDIRISINGHE VS JEFFREY ALAN SKLAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 AYANKA EDIRISINGHE filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against JEFFREY ALAN SKLAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7622

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

EDIRISINGHE AYANKA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1-20

FAIR EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP THE

SKLAR JEFFREY ALAN

Other

KREPACK VIVIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SCHEIDEMANTLE LAW GROUP PC

CARLA FORD LAW APC

Defendant Attorney

LIBERATORE ANTHONY A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Unknown

3/23/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/23/2018: Unknown

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/11/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/11/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Unknown

4/17/2018: Unknown

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES; ORDER

4/24/2018: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES; ORDER

Minute Order

6/13/2018: Minute Order

NON-PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANCE OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF; ETC.

8/10/2018: NON-PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANCE OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF; ETC.

NON-PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANCE OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF

8/10/2018: NON-PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANCE OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF

Proof of Service

8/13/2018: Proof of Service

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NON- PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION TO QUASH, SHORTENING TIME, AND/OR SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING ON A MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE

8/14/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NON- PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION TO QUASH, SHORTENING TIME, AND/OR SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING ON A MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE

Minute Order

8/14/2018: Minute Order

NON-PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY HER DEPOSITION AND/OR THE PRODUCTION OF ANY DOCUMENTS PENDING HEARING ON HER MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANC

8/14/2018: NON-PARTY VIVIAN KREPACK'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY HER DEPOSITION AND/OR THE PRODUCTION OF ANY DOCUMENTS PENDING HEARING ON HER MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANC

Minute Order

8/15/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY' VIVIAN KREPACK'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANCE OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF AND OPPOSITION TO REQUEST F

8/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY' VIVIAN KREPACK'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, AND/OR FOR ISSUANCE OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF AND OPPOSITION TO REQUEST F

PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT RE: MEDIATION, ETC

8/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT RE: MEDIATION, ETC

DECLARATTON OF ANTHONY A. LIBERATORE RE: MEDIATION

8/22/2018: DECLARATTON OF ANTHONY A. LIBERATORE RE: MEDIATION

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 56; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketOrder (re Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (and stay of proceedings) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (and stay of proceedings) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and stay of proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and stay of proceedings) of 01/29/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (and stay of proceedings) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketProof-Personal Service; Filed by Ayanka Edirisinghe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketProof-Personal Service; Filed by Ayanka Edirisinghe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketProof-Personal Service; Filed by Ayanka Edirisinghe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ayanka Edirisinghe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7622    Hearing Date: March 05, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AYANKA EDIRISINGHE, etc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

JEFFREY ALAN SKLAR, etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: ****7622

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Date: March 5, 2020

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

MOVING PARTY: Carla A. Ford

Carla A. Ford seeks to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Ayanka Edirisinghe. Counsel’s motion is compliant with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362.

In connection with the motion to be relieved as counsel, Carla A. Ford declares that there has been an irreconcilable breakdown in the relationship between the plaintiff-client and plaintiff’s counsel.

The Court has discretion on whether to allow an attorney to withdraw, and a motion to withdraw will not be granted where withdrawal would prejudice the client. (Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

In light of the facts above, the Court GRANTS Carla A. Ford’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Ayanka Edirisinghe.

Carla A. Ford is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 5th day of March 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court