This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 14:04:15 (UTC).

AYALA BORING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS RAGNAR BENSON CONSTRUCTION, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 AYALA BORING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAGNAR BENSON CONSTRUCTION, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6749

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYALA BORING INC.

Defendants

RAGNAR BENSON CONSTRUCTION LLC

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY PAUL

Defendant Attorney

ESTES ALLEN W III

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND TO SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

8/13/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND TO SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER AFTER RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO U.S. DISTRI...) OF 10/22/2021

10/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER AFTER RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO U.S. DISTRI...) OF 10/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER AFTER RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO U.S. DISTRI...)

10/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER AFTER RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO U.S. DISTRI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING REMAND) OF 12/17/2021

12/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING REMAND) OF 12/17/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING REMAND)

12/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING REMAND)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW REGARDING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW REGARDING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW REGARDING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/18/2022

1/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW REGARDING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/18/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Regarding Removal to Federal Court) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Regarding Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Regarding Removal to Federal Court) of 01/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Status Conference (RERemand) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference regarding Remand) of 12/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference regarding Remand)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docketat 2:51 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order After Receipt of Notice of Removal to U.S. Distri...) of 10/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order After Receipt of Notice of Removal to U.S. Distri...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND TO SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION; Filed by Ragnar Benson Construction, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ayala Boring, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ayala Boring, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ayala Boring, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less