This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2022 at 13:49:30 (UTC).

AVSHALOM YIZHAQ VS ANDREW KAPNEK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 AVSHALOM YIZHAQ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANDREW KAPNEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0630

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

YIZHAQ AVSHALOM

PERFECT GARAGE DOORS AND GATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

KAPNEK ANDREW

KAPNEK MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETARY JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL G. SEABOLT RE INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

10/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL G. SEABOLT RE INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/20/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Cross-Complaint

11/23/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/23/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

11/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

12/23/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/19/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ANDREW KAPNEK (Defendant); MARIA KAPNEK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ANDREW KAPNEK (Defendant); MARIA KAPNEK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Perfect Garage Doors and Gates, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant); AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by MARIA KAPNEK (Cross-Complainant); ANDREW KAPNEK (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by ANDREW KAPNEK (Defendant); MARIA KAPNEK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DANIEL G. SEABOLT RE INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT; Filed by ANDREW KAPNEK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AVSHALOM YIZHAQ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ETHAN OHAD