This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 23:56:17 (UTC).

AVRA PROPERTIES BEVERLY HILS I LLC VS FCM INVESTMENTS LLC ET

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 AVRA PROPERTIES BEVERLY HILS I LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCM INVESTMENTS LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0280

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

AVRA PROPERTIES BEVERLY HILLS 1 LLC

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

RVD INVESTMENTS LLC

FCM INVESTMENTS LLC

WEST COAST ESCROW COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

WELSH ROBERT C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

8/31/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/31/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/31/2018: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Avra Properties Beverly Hills 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Avra Properties Beverly Hills 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Avra Properties Beverly Hills 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Avra Properties Beverly Hills 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Avra Properties Beverly Hills 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Avra Properties Beverly Hills 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Avra Properties Beverly Hills 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCM INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST COAST ESCROW COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant