This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 16:08:15 (UTC).

AVIK MARTIROSYAN VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 AVIK MARTIROSYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5863

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIROSYAN AVIK

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Avik Martirosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Avik Martirosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Avik Martirosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOLONZ ADAM M.