This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 00:16:31 (UTC).

AVERY, CAMERON VS MILLER, ALYSSA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 AVERY, CAMERON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MILLER, ALYSSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4153

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AVERY CAMERON

Respondent

MILLER ALYSSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GLASS DAVID J

Respondent Attorney

WINSLOW DAVID CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Request - Trial Setting; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail (served: response to dissolution ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less