This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 09:30:39 (UTC).

AVALOS, ROGELIO E - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 AVALOS, ROGELIO E - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRY, WILLIAM, KLEIN, CLIFFORD, GARCIA, RUBEN and MATCHAM, SUSAN J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6365

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARRY, WILLIAM

MATCHAM, SUSAN J.

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

GARCIA, RUBEN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

CARRILLO CAROLYN

VANDER POORTEN VICTORIA

Decedent

AVALOS ROGELIO E

Guardian Ad Litem

SIMON JOEL M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOPEZ STEVE

Other Attorney

YUN MONICA CHUNG

Other Attorneys

CHEN JACKSON

 

Court Documents

Supplement - Stipulated First Supplement To Petition To Approve Terms Of Written Settlement Agreement (Comment)

7/18/2022: Supplement - Stipulated First Supplement To Petition To Approve Terms Of Written Settlement Agreement (Comment)

Minute Order

7/19/2022: Minute Order

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report of Guardian Ad Litem Objecting to Stipulated Petition to Approve Terms of Written Settlement Agreement

7/6/2022: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report of Guardian Ad Litem Objecting to Stipulated Petition to Approve Terms of Written Settlement Agreement

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

5/16/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

Minute Order

5/11/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing

5/4/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing

Letters - Special Administrator

5/5/2022: Letters - Special Administrator

Minute Order

4/21/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Notice of Remote Appearance

4/4/2022: Notice - Notice of Remote Appearance

Petition - Authority - Stipulated Petition to Approve Terms of Written Settlement Agreement (Letters)

4/4/2022: Petition - Authority - Stipulated Petition to Approve Terms of Written Settlement Agreement (Letters)

Notice - Hearing

4/8/2022: Notice - Hearing

Proof of Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Service

Letters - Special Administrator

5/25/2021: Letters - Special Administrator

Order - Appointing Special Administrator

5/13/2021: Order - Appointing Special Administrator

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

5/3/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Letters of Special Administration

4/20/2021: Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Letters of Special Administration

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Stipulated First Supplement To Petition To Approve Terms Of Written Settlement Agreement (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Report of Guardian Ad Litem Objecting to Stipulated Petition to Approve Terms of Written Settlement Agreement ); Filed by Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial) (Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial) - $465.00 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Contingent/Unliquidated ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less