Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 14:23:44 (UTC).

AVALOS, DANIELLE J VS AVALOS, GREGORY S

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 AVALOS, DANIELLE J filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AVALOS, GREGORY S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0882

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AVALOS DANIELLE J

Respondent

AVALOS GREGORY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTINELLI ERIC D

Respondent Attorney

OLIVER APRIL ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - re: child support

10/26/2020: Stipulation and Order - re: child support

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/16/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Miscellaneous - Demand For Petitioner's Preliminary Declaration Of Disclosure

8/27/2020: Miscellaneous - Demand For Petitioner's Preliminary Declaration Of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/4/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/22/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

7/22/2020: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service of Summons

7/22/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/22/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Response And UCCJEA

7/22/2020: Proof of Service - Response And UCCJEA

Summons

6/24/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/24/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/24/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/24/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

6/24/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/24/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re: child support ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Demand For Petitioner's Preliminary Declaration Of Disclosure ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Response And UCCJEA ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINELLI ERIC D