This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 03:11:06 (UTC).

AUTO FINANCE SOLUTIONS, LLC VS UNITED CARRIER, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 AUTO FINANCE SOLUTIONS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED CARRIER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8532

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO FINANCE SOLUTIONS LLC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

UNITED CARRIER INC. DBA UNITED CARRIER TOWING SERVICES

Cross Defendant

RITTER LIEN SALES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WISEMAN BRETT K.

Defendant Attorney

BROWN CURT

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MA JOYCE H.

Cross Defendant Attorney

BERKE JEFF

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

7/14/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

8/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/05/2022

8/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/05/2022

Request for Dismissal

8/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES [PROD...) OF 01/31/2022

1/31/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES [PROD...) OF 01/31/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES [PROD...)

1/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES [PROD...)

General Denial

2/1/2022: General Denial

Notice of Ruling

2/1/2022: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL CONTINUANCE

12/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRETT K. WISEMAN

12/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRETT K. WISEMAN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-C...) OF 12/16/2021

12/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-C...) OF 12/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-C...)

12/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-C...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT 2) TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND ORDER

12/16/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT 2) TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND ORDER

Cross-Complaint

12/17/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/28/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Ritter Lien Sales, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant) to Ritter Lien Sales, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2749540 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Pursuant to the Request for Dismissal filed by Auto Finance Solutions, LLC on 08/05/2022, in Complaint filed by Auto Finance Solutions, LLC on 03/04/2021 is dismissed with prejudice.The following event(s) is/are advanced to this date and vacated:08/29/2022 10:00 AM Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal in Department 62; Refers To Entire Action changed from Yes to No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by United Carrier, Inc. on 12/17/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by United Carrier, Inc. as to Ritter Lien Sales, Inc., a California Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: United Carrier, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Ritter Lien Sales, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Auto Finance Solutions, LLC on 03/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Auto Finance Solutions, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Auto Finance Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Auto Finance Solutions, LLC on 03/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Auto Finance Solutions, LLC as to United Carrier, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Brett K. Wiseman (Attorney): First Name changed from Jenos to Brett; Last Name changed from Firouznam-Heidari to Wiseman; Middle Name: K.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAddress for Brett K. Wiseman (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Auto Finance Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: United Carrier, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Auto Finance Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: United Carrier, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Auto Finance Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: United Carrier, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less