This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 12:12:20 (UTC).

AUTHENTIDISC LLC VS FARSHAD RABBANI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 AUTHENTIDISC LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against FARSHAD RABBANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0578

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTHENTIDISC LLC

Defendants

RABBANI FARSHAD

TIME ZONE ENT.PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUFFORD-COHEN REBECCA

Defendant Attorneys

MOVSESSIAN CASEY

HERMANSEN KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Motion for Attorney Fees

10/22/2021: Motion for Attorney Fees

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

11/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/13/2021: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

10/13/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/13/2021

10/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/13/2021

Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/13/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE))

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE))

Compliance with General Order for Limited Jurisdiction Unlawful Detainer [Eviction] Jury Trial Read - COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER FOR LIMITED JURISDICTION UNLAWFUL DETAINER [EVICTION] JURY TRIAL REA

9/20/2021: Compliance with General Order for Limited Jurisdiction Unlawful Detainer [Eviction] Jury Trial Read - COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER FOR LIMITED JURISDICTION UNLAWFUL DETAINER [EVICTION] JURY TRIAL REA

Notice of Ruling

9/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

9/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ORAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS

9/21/2021: Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ORAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys Fees); Filed by Authentidisc LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by Farshad Rabbani (Defendant); Time Zone Ent.Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Farshad Rabbani (Defendant); Time Zone Ent.Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Farshad Rabbani (Defendant); Time Zone Ent.Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Farshad Rabbani (Defendant); Time Zone Ent.Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((Unlawful Detainer)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Farshad Rabbani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Time Zone Ent.Properties LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Farshad Rabbani)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Authentidisc LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Authentidisc LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Authentidisc LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Authentidisc LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIME ZONE ENT.PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERMANSEN KEVIN