Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 22:41:32 (UTC).

AUSTIN, BETTY VS DANIELS, DAWNICE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 AUSTIN, BETTY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DANIELS, DAWNICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0076

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AUSTIN BETTY

Respondent

DANIELS DAWNICE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/17/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Personal Service on 1/29/2021 at 9:54AM

2/4/2021: Proof of Service - Personal Service on 1/29/2021 at 9:54AM

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

1/21/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/21/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/21/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Personal Service on 1/29/2021 at 9:54AM ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less