This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 09:22:04 (UTC).

AUSCENCIO CARRILLO ET AL VS ANALEA PAULE ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 AUSCENCIO CARRILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANALEA PAULE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6377

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARRILLO RUBEN

CARILLO AUSCENCIO

NORONA JESUS ALONSO

RODRIGUEZ CRYSTAL

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

BARAJAS ANA LAURA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PAULE WILFREDO

YI CHON TAE

PAULE ANALEA

YI CHING TEA

GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS INC

GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS INC.

RODRIGUEZ ANA

BARAJAS ANA

RODRIGUEZ LEONARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DRAKE BENJAMIN ESQ.

SCHWARZ MARC A.

MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

FIELDS GARY DAVID

CAPPS AARON GLENN

Other Attorneys

KORFF EVE HELENE

FIELDS GARY D.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2/1/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/5/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/1/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/1/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

3/7/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY AND EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

3/7/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY AND EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

Unknown

3/7/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

DEFENDANT CHONG TAE YI'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/9/2018: DEFENDANT CHONG TAE YI'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/17/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Related Case

11/1/2018: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case

12/11/2018: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

12/19/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/19/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/17/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Ex Parte Application

5/17/2019: Ex Parte Application

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Analea Paule (Legacy Party); Wilfredo Paule (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, Final Status Conference, and All Trial Related Cutoff Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, Final Stat...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial, Final Status Conference, and All Trial Related Cutoff Dates); Filed by Analea Paule (Legacy Party); Wilfredo Paule (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Lillian Kim (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Chong Tae Yi Erroneously Sued As Chon Tae Yi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Auscencio Carillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Auscencio Carillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Auscencio Carillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Auscencio Carillo (Plaintiff); Ruben Carrillo (Plaintiff); Jesus Alonso Norona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Auscencio Carillo (Plaintiff); Ruben Carrillo (Plaintiff); Jesus Alonso Norona (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****6377 Hearing Date: December 9, 2021 Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties are encouraged to meet and confer concerning this tentative ruling to determine if a resolution may be reached. If the parties are unable to reach a resolution and a party intends to submit on this tentative ruling, the party must send an email to the Court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating that party’s intention to submit. The email shall include the case number, date and time of the hearing, counsel’s contact information (if applicable), and the identity of the party submitting on this tentative ruling. If the Court does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may place the motion off calendar. If all parties do not submit on this tentative ruling, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely (which is highly encouraged). Further, after the Court has posted/issued a tentative ruling, the Court has the inherent authority to prohibit the withdrawal of the subject motion and adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the Court.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

December 9, 2021

CASE NUMBER

****6377 – Consolidated with BC694022, 8STLC01180, 18STLC13920, 18STCL14760

MOTION

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

MOVING PARTY

Lillian Kim

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Lillian Kim of Integra Law PC (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez and Leonel Ivan Rodriguez (collectively, “Plaintiffs”).

ANALYSIS

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for the motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. This is a valid reason for withdrawal. (See Rules Prof. Conduct, rule 1.16.) Accordingly, the Court grants the motion.

Counsel must serve the signed order (form MC-053), which shall include information about all future hearings and proceedings noticed by any party or ordered by the Court (including the hearing as set forth below), on Plaintiffs and all other parties who have appeared in the action, within 10 days of the date of this ruling, and file a proof of service of such. Counsel will remain the attorney of record for Plaintiffs until Counsel files the requisite proof of service. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).)

Further, the Court notes that Plaintiffs are minors, who appear in this action via their guardian ad litem, Ana Barajas (“Barajas”). Barajas cannot appear on behalf of Plaintiffs as self-represented litigants, as that would constitute the unauthorized practice of law. (See J.W. v. Superior Court (1993) 17 Cal.App.4th 958, 964.) Consequently, the Court sets a hearing on the status of legal representation for Plaintiffs on January 20, 2022 at 8:30 A.M. in Department 32 at Spring Street Courthouse.

'


Case Number: ****6377    Hearing Date: October 13, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

miguel Angel Gonzalez,

Plaintiff,

v.

analea paule, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****6377

Hearing Date: October 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses

Defendant Analea Paule (“Defendant”) moves to compel responses from Plaintiff Miguel Angel Gonzalez (“Plaintiff”) to: (1) Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“RPD”); (2) Form Interrogatories, Set One (“FROG”); and (3) Special Interrogatories, Set One (“SROG”). Defendant served the written discovery on Plaintiff by mail on November 26, 2019. Plaintiff’s responses were thus due by December 31, 2019. As of the filing date of these motions, Defendant has not received responses from Plaintiff. Plaintiff has not opposed the motion, and there is nothing in the record to suggest that Plaintiff has complied with his discovery obligations. Therefore, the motions are granted.

Defendant seeks sanctions in connection with the motions. The Court finds that Plaintiff’s failure to respond to discovery is an abuse of the discovery process. The Court awards sanctions against Plaintiff and her counsel of record, Prestige Law Group, in the amount of $880, which represents four hours of attorney time to prepare the motions and attend the hearing at $190 per hour, plus two filing fees of $60 each.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motions to compel responses to the RPD, FROG, and SROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff and her counsel of record, Prestige Law Group, jointly and severally, are ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $880 to Defendant, by and through counsel, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Defendant is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: October 13, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****6377    Hearing Date: August 19, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

miguel angel gonzalez,

Plaintiff,

v.

analea paulie, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 18STLC13920, consolidated with

****6377, BC694022,

18STLC01180, 18STLC14760

Hearing Date: August 19, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses

Defendant Analea Paule (“Defendant”) moves to compel responses from Plaintiff Miguel Angel Gonzalez (“Plaintiff”) to: (1) Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“RPD”); (2) Form Interrogatories, Set One (“FROG”); and (3) Special Interrogatories, Set One (“SROG”). On November 1, 2019, Plaintiff’s counsel filed a notice of change of address. Defendant served these motions at the prior address. There are no oppositions on file, suggesting that Plaintiff’s counsel did not receive the motions. Therefore, the motions are denied without prejudice. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: August 19, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****6377    Hearing Date: July 01, 2020    Dept: 32

NEW TENTATIVE ORDER

auscencio carrillo, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

analea paule, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****6377 (Consolidated with

18STLC01180 and BC694022)

Hearing Date: July 1, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTIONs TO consolidate

Defendants Chong Tae Yi and Analea Paule (“Defendants”) move to consolidate this case with Gonzalez v. Paule, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. 18STLC13920) and Negrete v. Paule, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. 18STLC14760). Per Local Rule 3.3, subdivision (g), “Cases may not be consolidated unless they are in the same department. A motion to consolidate two or more cases may be noticed and heard after the cases, initially filed in different departments, have been related into a single department, or if the cases were already assigned to that department.” (Super. Ct. L.A. County, Local Rules, rule 3.3(g)(1).) All cases are now pending in Department #32. The motion sets forth good causes for consolidation. Finally, there is no opposition to the motion. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendants’ motions to consolidate this case with Gonzalez v. Paule, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. 18STLC13920) and Negrete v. Paule, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. 18STLC14760) is granted. Case Number ****6377 shall be the lead case, meaning that the final status conference and trial shall be held as follows:

Final Status Conference: October 1, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: October 15, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on this trial date. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: July 1, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KORFF EVE H. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELDS GARY D.