Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 04:03:27 (UTC).

AURORA ANDREA REYES ET AL VS ROSSIANO RABON ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 AURORA ANDREA REYES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROSSIANO RABON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO, GEORGINA T. RIZK, ROBERT B. BROADBELT, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5664

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

GEORGINA T. RIZK

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

REYES AURORA ANDREA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

Defendants and Respondents

RABON ROSSIANO

DOES 1 TO 50

COSMO LOMBINO

COSMO AND NATHALIA INC

LOMBINO COSMO

COSMO AND NATHALIA INC.

Minors and Not Classified By Court

JOVEL KHLOE

JOVEL ANTHONY ROMEO

REYES AURORA ANDREA

DUSTIN GRANADOS GUEVARA

GARCIA FLOR IDALIA GUEVARA

Guardian Ad Litem and Not Classified By Court

REYES AURORA ANDREA

Other

ANDY HOLLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MAAS PAUL D. ESQUIRE

MAAS PAUL D. ESQ.

LIEBER MARK ESQ.

MONROE SCOTT W. ESQ.

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MONROE SCOTT W. ESQ.

LERMAN JEFFREY E. ESQ.

MACKEY ROBERT T. ESQ.

HEATHCOTE TAMARA

REIMERS ETHAN A. ESQ.

O'DELL ANDREW S.

HOLLINS ANDREW S.

MACKEY ROBERT ESQ.

WOOD CARY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LERMAN JEFFREY E. ESQ.

MACKEY ROBERT T. ESQ.

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

LIEBER MARK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF ORDER AND FUNDS FOR DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT

3/19/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF ORDER AND FUNDS FOR DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/01/2020

10/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/01/2020

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/14/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT - DUSTIN GRENADOS GUEVARA

12/14/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT - DUSTIN GRENADOS GUEVARA

Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

1/16/2020: Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

Case Management Statement

1/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ETHAN A. REIMERS IN SUPPORT

10/31/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ETHAN A. REIMERS IN SUPPORT

Request for Judicial Notice

10/31/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

12/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/6/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Consolidate

12/16/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ETHAN A. REIMERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES LASC BC695664 AND LASC BC695803

12/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ETHAN A. REIMERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES LASC BC695664 AND LASC BC695803

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/24/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Legacy Document -

10/3/2018: Legacy Document -

RULING RE:MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ROSSIANO RABON

9/13/2018: RULING RE:MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ROSSIANO RABON

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/18/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

SUMMONS -

4/9/2018: SUMMONS -

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Filing of Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account (for Minor Claimants Anthony Romeo Jovel, Khloe Leonor Jovel, and Dustin Grenados Guevara)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Filing of Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account (for Minor Claimants Anthony Romeo Jovel, Khloe Leonor Jovel, and Dustin Grenados Guevara)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE OSC RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Rossiano Rabon (Defendant); Cosmo Lombino (Defendant); Cosmo and Nathalia, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 3:54 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/24/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Cosmo Lombino (Defendant); Cosmo and Nathalia Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF ORDER AND FUNDS FOR DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT); Filed by Khloe Jovel (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Attorney Re: OSC to Show Cause); Filed by Dustin Granados Guevara (Plaintiff); Gregoria Granados Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF ORDER AND FUNDS FOR DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT; Filed by Anthony Romeo Jovel (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Aurora Andrea Reyes (Legacy Party); Reyes, Aurora Andrea individually and as (Plaintiff); Anthony Romeo Jovel (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reyes, Aurora Andrea individually and as (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695664    Hearing Date: December 14, 2020    Dept: 53

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles – Central District

Department 53

Aurora Andrea reyes , et al.;

Plaintiffs,

vs.

ROSSIANO RABON , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC695664 c/w BC695803

Hearing Date:

December 14, 2020

Time:

8:30 a.m.

[Tentative] Order RE:

(1) petition to approve compromise of pending action on behalf of minor (anthony romeo jovel);

(2) petition to approve compromise of pending action on behalf of minor (khloe leonor jovel);

(3) petition to approve compromise of pending action on behalf of minor (dustin granados guevara)

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff and petitioner Aurora Andrea Reyes

RESPONDING PARTY: n/a

  1. Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor (Anthony Romeo Jovel);

  2. Petition to Approve of Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor (Khloe Leonor Jovel);

The court considered the moving papers. No opposition to the petition was filed.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff and petitioner Flor Idalia Guevara Garcia

RESPONDING PARTY: n/a

  1. Petition to Approve of Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor (Dustin Granados Guevara)

The court considered the moving papers. No opposition to the petition was filed.

BACKGROUND

This matter consists of two consolidated wrongful death and survival actions, and the parties have reached a settlement.

Plaintiff and petitioner Aurora Andrea Reyes seeks court approval of the settlement on behalf of claimants Anthony Romeo Jovel and Khloe Leonor Jovel, who are minors.

Plaintiff and petitioner Flor Idalia Guevara Garcia seeks court approval of the settlement on behalf of claimant Dustin Granados Guevara, who is a minor.

Defendants Rossiano Rabon, Cosmo Lombino, Nathalia Lombino, and Cosmo and Nathalia Inc. have agreed to pay a total of $135,000 to plaintiffs to settle this action, of which (1) $17,500 is allocated to claimant Anthony Romeo Jovel, (2) $17,500 is allocated to claimant Khloe Leonor Jovel, and (3) $15,000 is allocated to claimant Dustin Granados Guevara.

Of the $17,500 that is allocated to claimant Anthony Romeo Jovel, $4,375 will be paid to counsel for claimant Anthony Romeo Jovel for attorney’s fees, and the remaining $13,125 will be deposited in a blocked account.

Of the $17,500 that is allocated to claimant Khloe Leonor Jovel, $4,375 will be paid to counsel for claimant Khloe Leonor Jovel, and the remaining $13,125 will be deposited in a blocked account.

Of the $15,000 that is allocated to claimant Dustin Granados Guevara, $3,750 will be paid to counsel for claimant Dustin Granados Guevara, and the remaining $11,250 will be deposited in a blocked account.

Legal Standard

The compromise of a minor’s disputed claim for damages is valid only after it has been approved, upon the filing of a petition, by the court. (Prob. Code, § 3500.) The petition must be verified by the petitioner, must contain a full disclosure of all information that has any bearing upon the reasonableness of the compromise, and must be prepared on judicial council form MC-350. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 7.950.)

Discussion

The court has reviewed the petitions and finds the settlement to be fair and reasonable, and in the best interests of claimants Anthony Romeo Jovel, Khloe Leonor Jovel, and Dustin Granados Guevara.

The court finds that claimants Anthony Romeo Jovel and Khloe Leonor Jovel’s counsel’s declaration is sufficient to support the attorney’s fees requested. The court therefore grants plaintiff and petitioner Aurora Andrea Reyes’s petitions and approves the compromise of pending action as to claimants Anthony Romeo Jovel and Khloe Leonor Jovel.

The court finds that claimant Dustin Granados Guevara’s counsel’s declaration is sufficient to support the attorney’s fees requested. The court therefore grants plaintiff and petitioner Flor Idalia Guevara Garcia’s petition and approves the compromise of pending action as to claimant Dustin Granados Guevara.

The court orders petitioners Aurora Andrea Reyes and Flor Idalia Guevara Garcia to give notice of this order.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

DATED: December 14, 2020

_____________________________

Robert B. Broadbelt III

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC695664    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 2

BC695664 Reyes et al v. Rabon

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motion to Consolidate set for hearing on 12/2/19 is continued to 1/3/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2. The due date for the opposition and reply is based on the original hearing date.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBER MARK