This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 06:48:31 (UTC).

AURELIA BENITEZ VS BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 AURELIA BENITEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, THOMAS D. LONG, HOLLY E. KENDIG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3308

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

THOMAS D. LONG

HOLLY E. KENDIG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BENITEZ AURELIA

Respondents and Defendants

BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SALEH HUSSIN ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

NORMA PEDROZA CHAVEZ

CHAVEZ NORMA PEDROZA

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

11/16/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPOINT A SU...)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPOINT A SU...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPOINT A SU...) OF 11/16/2021

11/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPOINT A SU...) OF 11/16/2021

Order - Dismissal

11/16/2021: Order - Dismissal

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/28/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/28/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/25/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/25/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/29/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD;)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD;)

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

8/12/2021: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)]

10/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE OR JURY TRIAL) OF 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE OR JURY TRIAL) OF 04/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE OR JURY TRIAL)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE OR JURY TRIAL)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for Failure to Appoint a Successor-In-Interest) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Appoint a Su...) of 11/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Appoint a Su...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Final Status Conference)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 10/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Bodega Latina Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketBODEGA LATINA CORPORATJON DBA EL SUPER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bodega Latina Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Aurelia Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aurelia Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BC683308 Hearing Date: July 29, 2021 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AURELIA BENITEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BODEGA LATINA CORP., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC683308

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

July 29, 2021

Counsel, Hussein H. Saleh, moves to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been a complete breakdown in attorney-client relationship. The motion is denied without prejudice. There is no proof of service of the motion, declaration, and proposed order on Plaintiff and all other parties who have appeared in the case. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(d).) Further, on form MC-051 Counsel seemingly indicates he is seeking to be relieved as counsel for a Francisco Sanchez, who is not a party to this action, while on form MC-053, Counsel moves to be relieved as counsel of record for Aurelia Benitez. Counsel must correct this discrepancy and also provides the party’s name on form MC-052, which Counsel failed to do.

Based on the foregoing, moving Counsel’s motion to be relieved is denied without prejudice.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 29th day of July, 2021

Hon. Charles Lee

Judge of the Superior Court

'

Case Number: BC683308    Hearing Date: June 8, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AURELIA BENITEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BODEGA LATINA CORP., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC683308

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

June 8, 2021

Counsel, Hussein H. Saleh, moves to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been a complete breakdown in attorney-client relationship.  The motion is denied without prejudice.  There is no proof of service of the motion, declaration, and proposed order on Plaintiff and all other parties who have appeared in the case.  (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(d).) 

Moreover, Counsel asserts Plaintiff was served by mail with the moving papers at Plaintiff’s last known address, but Counsel fails to provide through what means the address was confirmed in the past 30 days.  Further, on form MC-051 Counsel seemingly indicates he is seeking to be relieved as counsel for a Francisco Sanchez, who is not a party to this action. 

Based on the foregoing, moving Counsel’s motion to be relieved is denied without prejudice.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 8th day of June, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALEH HUSSEIN H.