This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 08:21:29 (UTC).

AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN VS JOSE ANGEL ARAGON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ANGEL ARAGON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1102

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERAN AURELIA BELTRAN

Defendants

ARAGON GRACIELA

ARAGON JOSE ANGEL

CALTRANS

SOUTHERN PACIFIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK

THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATTON FOR THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

UNION PACIFIC CORPORATION

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEECHER BRIAN G.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHROEDER JEREMY J.

ALMAZAN ARACELI

GLAZER WILLIAM J

PELCH MANAL H.

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/29/2022: Answer

Answer

11/28/2022: Answer

Answer

11/22/2022: Answer

Answer

11/8/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

10/25/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 2:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (Defendant); As to: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant); CALTRANS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK (Defendant); As to: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Defendant); As to: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 117.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 117.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 167.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK (Defendant); Service Date: 10/31/2022; Service Cost: 117.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: UNION PACIFIC CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 117.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 117.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATTON FOR THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK (Defendant); Service Date: 10/31/2022; Service Cost: 117.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: CALTRANS (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 167.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 02:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ANGEL ARAGON (Defendant); GRACIELA ARAGON (Defendant); THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ANGEL ARAGON (Defendant); GRACIELA ARAGON (Defendant); THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AURELIA BELTRAN TERAN (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ANGEL ARAGON (Defendant); GRACIELA ARAGON (Defendant); THE CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNION PACIFIC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALTRANS is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant