This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2022 at 11:15:21 (UTC).

AURA E. MIJANGOS, ET AL. VS EVELYN LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 AURA E MIJANGOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EVELYN LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6782

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIJANGOS AURA E.

ORTIZ MIGUEL

Defendant

LOPEZ EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALABISE PATRICIA D.

AVILA ANALICIA D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

3/7/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

PI General Order

1/3/2022: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2024
  • Hearing12/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • Hearing06/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Aura E. Mijangos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aura E. Mijangos (Plaintiff); Miguel Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aura E. Mijangos (Plaintiff); Miguel Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aura E. Mijangos (Plaintiff); Miguel Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALABISE PATRICIA DENISE