This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2022 at 03:28:39 (UTC).

AUGUSTINE ROTIBI VS COX ENTERPRISE INC.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 AUGUSTINE ROTIBI filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against COX ENTERPRISE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0830

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROTIBI AUGUSTINE

Defendant

COX ENTERPRISE INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/6/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/13/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7/11/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/6/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Cox Enterprise Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Augustine Rotibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Augustine Rotibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Augustine Rotibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cox Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant