This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 07:33:39 (UTC).

AUGUSTA PRECIOUS METALS VS RED ROCK SECURED LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 AUGUSTA PRECIOUS METALS filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against RED ROCK SECURED LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6089

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METALS AUGUSTA PRECIOUS

Defendants and Respondents

KELLY SHADE

WARD JEFF

JOHNSON-KELLY SEAN

RAZURI ANDREA

JOHNSON SEAN

DOMBROSKI WALTER

RED ROCK SECURED LLC

JOHNSON-KELLY SHADE

BERGL LAURENCE

HORNING CODY

JOHNSON FRANK

KEMENOSH MAK

HERRING RODERICK

WILCOX SCOTT

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER HOWARD S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

COSTA JOSEPH P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request

1/16/2019: Request

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/23/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/28/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/31/2019: Unknown

SUMMONS

3/30/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE COMPUTER DATA ACCESS AND FRAUD ACT (PENAL CODE 502) ; ETC

3/30/2017: COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE COMPUTER DATA ACCESS AND FRAUD ACT (PENAL CODE 502) ; ETC

MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF ANDREA BREUER

4/3/2017: MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF ANDREA BREUER

Minute Order

4/5/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/6/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/27/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/27/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/11/2019

Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 01/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2019

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Augusta Precious Metals (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2019

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2019

DocketRequest (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION); Filed by Augusta Precious Metals (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DocketNOTICE OF VACATING DEFAULT OR NON-COMPLIANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2017

DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2017

DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
194 More Docket Entries
04/06/2017

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2017

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2017

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2017

DocketMinute order entered: 2017-04-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2017

DocketMOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF ANDREA BREUER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2017

DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Augusta Precious Metals (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2017

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2017

DocketComplaint; Filed by Augusta Precious Metals (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2017

DocketCOMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE COMPUTER DATA ACCESS AND FRAUD ACT (PENAL CODE 502) ; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less