This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 17:56:06 (UTC).

AUDREY BARNES, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS LYNWOOD CHARLES WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 AUDREY BARNES, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LYNWOOD CHARLES WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL, JR ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6188

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARNES AN INDIVIDUAL AUDREY

LINAREZ AN INDIVIDUAL DEJOHN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BROWN AN INDIVIDUAL AUSTIN

WALKER AN INDIVIDUAL LYNWOOD CHARLES JR.

FARLEY ABRON

FARLEY GABERELLA

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAPMAN CHRISTOFER R.

Defendant Attorneys

CHILDS MARY

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Quash

12/1/2022: Motion to Quash

Separate Statement

12/1/2022: Separate Statement

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/16/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Association of Attorney

5/26/2022: Association of Attorney

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/2/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/2/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/3/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/6/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

6/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/9/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2023
  • Hearing10/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash SUBPONEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • Hearing09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Hearing02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does/Roes scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/08/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Filed by: Audrey Barnes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by: Audrey Barnes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash SUBPONEA scheduled for 09/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Audrey Barnes, an individual (Plaintiff); Dejohn Linarez, an individual (Plaintiff); Nahum Beaired, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem, Audrey Barnes (Plaintiff); As to: Abron Farley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Audrey Barnes, an individual (Plaintiff); Dejohn Linarez, an individual (Plaintiff); Nahum Beaired, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem, Audrey Barnes (Plaintiff); As to: Gaberella Farley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Austin Brown, an individual (Defendant), Lynwood Charles Walker, an individual, Jr. (Defendant) to Lynwood Charles Walker, an individual, Jr. (Defendant), Austin Brown, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Audrey Barnes, an individual (Plaintiff); Dejohn Linarez, an individual (Plaintiff); Nahum Beaired, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem, Audrey Barnes (Plaintiff); As to: Lynwood Charles Walker, an individual, Jr. (Defendant); Austin Brown, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Audrey Barnes, an individual (Plaintiff); Dejohn Linarez, an individual (Plaintiff); Nahum Beaired, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem, Audrey Barnes (Plaintiff); As to: Lynwood Charles Walker, an individual, Jr. (Defendant); Austin Brown, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAENZA CHRISTOPHER E. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARPENTER GREGORY J.