This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 01:29:54 (UTC).

AUBREY ANGULO ET AL VS LEE EDDIE ACOSTA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by AUBREY ANGULO against LEE EDDIE ACOSTA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0522

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGULO MIGUEL

Defendants and Respondents

TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING

LV/LA EXPRESS

DOES 1 TO 100

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

MENJIVAR FILANDER

ADD DISTRIBUTION INC.

Guardian Ad Litem

GRIGGS ASHLEY

Minor

ANGULO AUBREY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

6/14/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

Minute Order

6/18/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

6/18/2019: Ex Parte Application

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/17/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Continuance of Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (For Continuance of Trial Date; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of Eber N. Bayona; Exhibits); Filed by Aubrey Angulo (Plaintiff); Miguel Angulo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Guardian ad litem re: Aubrey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Miguel Angulo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690522    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES, JUDGE MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT presiding in Department 74 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.