This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2020 at 22:02:00 (UTC).

ATM PROFESSIONAL INC ET AL VS FLORENTINO APELES

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 ATM PROFESSIONAL INC filed an Other lawsuit against FLORENTINO APELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2125

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ATM PROFESSIONAL INC

ZARGAR MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent

APELES FLORENTINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GENTINO ROBERT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

3/13/2018: Minute Order -

ORDER

3/28/2018: ORDER

Minute Order -

3/28/2018: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order -

4/2/2018: Minute Order -

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON THE PETITION, ETC

4/2/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON THE PETITION, ETC

PETITIONERS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/13/2018: PETITIONERS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order -

4/23/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

4/30/2018: Minute Order -

ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH PREJUDICE

4/30/2018: ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH PREJUDICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/30/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF RULING RE: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order -

5/15/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF NEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/20/2018: NOTICE OF NEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/30/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

SUMMONS -

1/12/2018: SUMMONS -

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

1/12/2018: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 69; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ATM Professional Inc (Plaintiff); Michael Zargar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF NEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATM PROFESSIONAL INC. is a litigant