This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 07:38:27 (UTC).

ATLAS VI JCP CARSON LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SUBWAY REAL ESTATE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 ATLAS VI JCP CARSON LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUBWAY REAL ESTATE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1684

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLAS VI JCP CARSON LLC

Defendants

SALEHI BEHZAD

SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODKIN DANIEL L.

Defendant Attorneys

CHUNG MICHAEL

KHANMOHAMED AZIM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/27/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/21/2022: Answer

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/24/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Case Management Statement

1/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/30/2023: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • Hearing03/06/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Hearing03/06/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Atlas VI JCP Carson LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 02:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/06/2023 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Behzad Salehi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Behzad Salehi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 02:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Subway Real Estate, LLC (Defendant); As to: Atlas VI JCP Carson LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAddress for Daniel L. Goodkin (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Atlas VI JCP Carson LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from ATLAS VI JCP CARSON LLC, a Delaware limited liability company to Atlas VI JCP Carson LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ATLAS VI JCP CARSON LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SUBWAY REAL ESTATE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Behzad Salehi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ATLAS VI JCP CARSON LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SUBWAY REAL ESTATE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Behzad Salehi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ATLAS VI JCP CARSON LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SUBWAY REAL ESTATE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Behzad Salehi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOODKIN DANIEL L.