This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 02:47:16 (UTC).

ATI RESTORATION, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SWINERTON BUILDERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 ATI RESTORATION, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SWINERTON BUILDERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6145

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATI RESTORATION LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1-20

SWINERTON BUILDERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICARLANTONIO DONNA MARIE

Defendant Attorney

LEE BENNETT J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

4/15/2022: Answer

Notice of Related Case

4/15/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

5/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FIL...) OF 05/31/2022

5/31/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FIL...) OF 05/31/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FIL...)

5/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER DENYING THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FIL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Order Denying the Notice of Related Case Fil...) of 05/31/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Order Denying the Notice of Related Case Fil...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ATI Restoration, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Swinerton Builders, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Swinerton Builders, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Swinerton Builders, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ATI Restoration, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ATI Restoration, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ATI Restoration, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ATI Restoration, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ATI Restoration, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATI Restoration, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SWINERTON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, BENNETT J.