This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2020 at 17:30:47 (UTC).

ATHENA KAROS VS CITY OF BURBANK

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 ATHENA KAROS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BURBANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9972

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KAROS ATHENA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 150

BURBANK CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KELLOGG CAROL D.

KELLOGG CAROL DEIRDRE

Defendant Attorney

ALBANO AMELIA ANN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR

4/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RE-SCHEDULE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;) OF 04/29/2020

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RE-SCHEDULE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;) OF 04/29/2020

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/17/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/17/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Separate Statement

2/11/2020: Separate Statement

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/11/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Association of Attorney

2/14/2019: Association of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/19/2018: Answer

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

8/30/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

8/30/2018: SUMMONS -

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Athena karos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:06 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order RE Re-Schedule of Motion for Summary Judgment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE Re-Schedule of Motion for Summary Judgment;) of 04/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 2:51 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...) of 04/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Burbank, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Athena karos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Burbank, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Athena karos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Burbank, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Athena karos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Athena karos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURBANK CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMELIA ANN ALBANO