This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 06:10:45 (UTC).

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, LLC VS BE LA CIENEGA LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BE LA CIENEGA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5674

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA LLC

Petitioners

ISAACSON DEAN

DE MIRANDA JAY

Claimant

MITCHEL SILBERBERG & KNUPP

Defendants

WEINSTOCK DARREN

ZZ HOLDINGS LLC

DBJKG LLC

BE LA CIENEGA LLC

BE 1022 LA CIENEGA LLC

BE DBV L.P

ZALBEN ZACHARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EANET MATTHEW LEO

MERVIS LAINE

WARD MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDS RONALD

ROTHSCHILD STEPHEN DAVIDS

FREUND JONATHAN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave to Intervene - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY INTERVENTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION AND STAY OF DISMISSAL

2/9/2021: Motion for Leave to Intervene - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY INTERVENTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION AND STAY OF DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION; DECLARATIONS OF HOWARD E. KING AND RONALD RICHARDS

2/8/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION; DECLARATIONS OF HOWARD E. KING AND RONALD RICHARDS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 02/09/2021

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 02/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY INTERVENTION OR...)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY INTERVENTION OR...)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MATTHEW T. WARD RE EX PARTE NOTICE

2/8/2021: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MATTHEW T. WARD RE EX PARTE NOTICE

Motion for Leave to Intervene

2/8/2021: Motion for Leave to Intervene

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER EXPUNGING LIS PENDENS

11/16/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER EXPUNGING LIS PENDENS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, LLCS (1) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ZACHARY ZALBENS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 17

11/2/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, LLCS (1) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ZACHARY ZALBENS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 17

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ZACHARY ZALBENS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (AND RELATED FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 17.1); SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEP

11/6/2020: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ZACHARY ZALBENS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (AND RELATED FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 17.1); SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEP

Notice - NOTICE OF NO RESPONSES RECEIVED TO PROPOSED ORDER EXPUNGING LIS PENDENS [CRC 3.1312(B)]

11/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NO RESPONSES RECEIVED TO PROPOSED ORDER EXPUNGING LIS PENDENS [CRC 3.1312(B)]

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/26/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER CONFIRMATION AWARD BY JAMS; CASE MA...)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER CONFIRMATION AWARD BY JAMS; CASE MA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 10/27/2020

10/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 10/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

10/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

146 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Mandatory Intervention or Alternatively for Permissive Intervention and for Stay of Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:25 AM in Department 74; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Mandatory Intervention or Alternatively for Permissive Intervention) - Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Mandatory Intervention or...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Mandatory Intervention or Alternatively for Permissive Intervention and Stay of Dismissal; Filed by Jay de Miranda (Petitioner); Dean Isaacson (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Assisted Living America, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOpposition (OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION; DECLARATIONS OF HOWARD E. KING AND RONALD RICHARDS); Filed by ZZ HOLDINGS LLC, (Defendant); Zachary Zalben (Defendant); BE DBV, L.P, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Intervene ((ex parte application)); Filed by Assisted Living America, LLC, (Plaintiff); Jay de Miranda (Petitioner); Dean Isaacson (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketOpposition (plaintiff's opposition to defendants darren weinstock and zachary zalben's ex parte application for an order advancing the hearing date on defendants' motion to expunge lis pendens); Filed by Assisted Living America, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order (to Expunge Lis Pendens); Filed by DARREN WEINSTOCK (Defendant); Zachary Zalben (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Assisted Living America, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Assisted Living America, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Assisted Living America, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Assisted Living America, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5674    Hearing Date: November 16, 2020    Dept: 74

*******5674 ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA vs BE LA CIENEGA

Defendant Zachary Zalben’s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission and Form Interrogatory 17.1

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall serve complete, verified, code-compliant responses within 20 days. Both parties’ requests for sanctions are DENIED.

Although a portion of a request is objectionable the “the remainder of the request shall be answered.” Plaintiff failed to comply with Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.230(a) as it did not provide responses to any portion of Zalben’s requests.



Case Number: *******5674    Hearing Date: October 02, 2020    Dept: 74

*******5674 ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, LLC vs BE LA CIENEGA LLC

Defendants Darren Weinstock and Zachary Zalben’s Amended Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens and Request for Sanctions (joined by BE La Cienega and BE 1022 La Cienega LLC)

TENTATIVE RULING: The hearing on this motion, the post-arbitration status conference and case management conference are CONTINUED to October 26, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. to afford plaintiff the opportunity to respond to new evidence submitted by defendants on reply. Plaintiff may file and serve a memorandum of points and authorities of no more than 5 pages as well as any other evidence in response to the evidence defendant submitted in support of its reply no later than October 7, 2020.

Evidentiary Objections

Defendants’ Objections to the Declaration of Dean Isaacson

The following objections are SUSTAINED: 23, 28, and 29. All other objections are OVERRULED.

Plaintiff’s Objections to the Supplemental Declaration of Stephen D. Rothschild

The following objection is SUSTAINED: 5. All other objections are OVERRULED.



Case Number: *******5674    Hearing Date: August 18, 2020    Dept: 74

*******5674 ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, LLC vs BE LA CIENEGA LLC

(1) Plaintiff’s Motion for Protective Order

(2) Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Discovery from Be La Cienega

(3) Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Discovery from Be La Cienega and Be 1022 La Cienega

TENTATIVE RULINGS

(1) Plaintiff’s Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified, code compliant responses within 20 days. All requests for sanctions are DENIED.

(2) Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Discovery from Be La Cienega and (3) Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Discovery from Be La Cienega and Be 1022 La Cienega are GRANTED. Defendants are ordered to serve verified, code compliant responses within 20 days and to produce all responsive documents within 30 days. To the extent defendant claims a privilege or asserts a right to privacy over any of the responsive documents or information, defendant shall simultaneously serve a privilege log with the document production that, at a minimum, identifies each document for which a privilege or privacy right is claimed, its author, recipients, date of preparation, and the specific privilege or privacy right claimed. All requests for sanctions are DENIED.



Case Number: *******5674    Hearing Date: August 11, 2020    Dept: 74

*******5674 ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA vs BE LA CIENEGA LLC

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories to (1) Be La Cienega LLC and (2) Be 1022 La Cienega LLC

TENTATIVE RULINGS: Both motions are GRANTED. Defendants shall serve verified, code compliant responses to these interrogatories within 20 days. Plaintiff’s request for sanctions is GRANTED. Defendant shall pay plaintiff sanctions in the amount of $1,220 within 30 days. Moving party to give notice.

Plaintiff propounded this discovery on November 6, 2019. Defendants failed to respond, assert that Plaintiff’s email service of the discovery requests is improper, and argue this action is stayed due to the arbitration of two causes of action. The stay order, however, specifically allows discovery relating to Zalben’s and Weinstock’s motion to expunge lis pendens.

CRC Rule 2.251(a) states, “When a document may be served by mail, express mail, overnight delivery, or fax transmission, the document may be served electronically under Code of Civil Procedure section 1010.6 and the rules in this chapter.” While a party may expressly consent to electronic service, as noted above, such is not required. As such, Defendants’ improper service argument fails.

Service was proper. “When a document may be served by mail, express mail, overnight delivery, or fax transmission, the document may be served electronically under Code of Civil Procedure section 1010.6 and the rules in this chapter.” CRC Rule 2.251(a).

Sanctions

Plaintiff is entitled to an order compelling Defendants’ response and an award of sanctions. Plaintiff complied with C.C.P. ;2023.040 by requesting sanctions in its notice and identifying the person against whom the sanction is sought.

Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff’s motion to compel and sanctions in the amount of $1,220 (filing fees for each motion and two hours to draft each motion at a rate of $550 per hour.)



Case Number: *******5674    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: 74

*******5674 ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, LLC vs BE LA CIENEGA LLC

Plaintiff’s Motions to Compel Discovery

TENTATIVE RULINGS:

  1. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Darren Weinstock to Respond to Form Interrogatories (set one) is GRANTED.

  2. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Zachary Zalben to Respond to Form Interrogatories (set one) is GRANTED.

  3. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Darren Weinstock to Respond to Special Interrogatories (set one) is GRANTED.

  4. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Zachary Zalben to Respond to Special Interrogatories (set one) is GRANTED.

  5. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Darren Weinstock to Respond to Requests for Production of Documents (set one) is GRANTED.

  6. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Zachary Zalbe to Respond to Requests for Production of Documents (set one) is GRANTED.

Plaintiff propounded each discovery request upon Defendants on September 20, 2019. Defendants assert that Plaintiff’s email service of the discovery requests is improper and notes that this action is stayed due to the arbitration of two causes of action. The stay order, however, specifically allows discovery relating to Zalben’s and Weinstock’s motion to expunge lis pendens.

Service was proper. “When a document may be served by mail, express mail, overnight delivery, or fax transmission, the document may be served electronically under Code of Civil Procedure section 1010.6 and the rules in this chapter.” CRC Rule 2.251(a).

Sanctions

Plaintiff is entitled to an order compelling Defendants’ response and an award of sanctions. Plaintiff complied with C.C.P. ;2023.040 by requesting sanctions in its notice and identifying the person against whom the sanction is sought.

Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff’s motion to compel and sanctions in the amount of $3,660 (filing fees for each motion and six hours to draft each motion at a rate of $550 per hour.)