This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:03:30 (UTC).

ASIANA JONES VS SECRET SUNDAYZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 ASIANA JONES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SECRET SUNDAYZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1912

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JONES ASIANA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

SECRET SUNDAYZ

SIN CITY L.A.

LR 808 OLIVE 2-LLC

DOES 1 TO 90

LR 808 OLIVE 1 LLC

SUNDAYZ SECRET

KAWANA KOJI

BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP

NYX NIGHTLIFE GROUP LLC

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LR 808 OLIVE 2-LLC

LR 808 OLIVE 1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOLCHAN JEFFREY L. ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHNEIDER STEPHANIE BERMAN ESQ.

HAWLEY KELLI GAY

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/16/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/16/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/16/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/19/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/16/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/16/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/16/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

5/18/2017: PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

8/15/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

8/15/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

8/15/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

8/15/2017: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jeffrey L. Molchan, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by LR 808 Olive 2-LLC (Cross-Complainant); LR 808 Olive 1 LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Asiana Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC661912    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows. No opposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On May 18, 2017, Plaintiff Asiana Jones (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Secret Sundayz, LR 808 Olive-1 LLC, LR 808 Olive-2 LLC, Sun City L.A., and Does 1-90. The complaint alleges causes of action for negligence and premises liability. The action arises out of an improperly assembled pole on a stage intended for pole dancing, at premises located at 801 S. Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90014. Plaintiff, a customer at the premises sitting in front of the stage, alleges that the pole broke and fell away, causing injury to Plaintiff’s head. 

On November 16, 2017, Defendants LR 808 Olive-1 LLC and LR 808 Olive-2 LLC filed a cross-complaint as to Defendants Secret Sundayz, Sin City L.A., and Roes 1-25. 

On September 13, 2018, Plaintiff amended the complaint to substitute Loc Nguyen for Doe 1, NYX Nightlife Group, LLC for Doe 2, Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC for Doe 3, and Koji Kawana for Doe 4. 

On April 24, 2019, Plaintiff dismissed Defendants LR 808 Olive-1 LLC and LR 808 Olive-2 LLC from the action. On April 26, 2019, Defendants LR 808 Olive-1 LLC and LR 808 Olive-2 LLC dismissed the cross-complaint as to all cross-defendants

On June 19, 2019, the Court entered default as to Defendants Sin City L.A. and NYX Nightlife Group, LLC.

On July 10, 2019, Plaintiff dismissed Defendant Boulevard Nightlife Group. 

On August 20, 2019, the Court entered default as to Defendant Loc Nguyen. 

On August 22, 2019, Plaintiff dismissed Defendant Koji Kawana. On August 26, 2019, Plaintiff dismissed Defendant Secret Sundayz.

On February 11, 2020, attorney Jeffrey L. Molchan on behalf of Legal Offices of David Grey, counsel for Plaintiffs (“Counsel”), filed a motion to be relieved as counsel as to Plaintiff pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 284, subdivision (2). 

Trial is not set. An order to show cause regarding failure to file default judgment against Defendants Sin City L.A., NYX Nightlife Group, LLC, and Loc Nguyen is scheduled for March 18, 2020.  

PARTY’S REQUEST

Counsel seeks to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff due to irreconcilable differences that have arisen between Counsel and Plaintiff which prevents Counsel’s office from being able to effectively represent her. Additionally, Counsel declares that he forwarded a letter to Plaintiff requesting that she sign a substitution of attorney. 

LEGAL STANDARD

California Rule of Court rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires (1) notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

DISCUSSION

Counsel has completed and filed forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053. Counsel declares that he served Plaintiff by mail on February 11, 2020, at her last known address and attaches proof of service as to all forms. The Court notes that Counsel declares he was unable to confirm that Plaintiff’s address is current, after making efforts to mail the motion papers to Plaintiff’s last known address with return receipt requested, and calling Plaintiff’s last known telephone number.

The Court finds that the motion is proper. There is no indication that Plaintiff would be prejudiced or that the orderly process of justice would be disrupted in granting this motion, as trial is not set in the matter. 

CONCLUSION

The motion is GRANTED.

Counsel is relieved as counsel for Plaintiff effective upon the filing of the proof of service of Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel–Civil form MC–053.

Counsel is ordered to give notice of this ruling.