This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 17:37:49 (UTC).

ASHRAF NAIMLATIF SERGYOUS VS ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 ASHRAF NAIMLATIF SERGYOUS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7867

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

SERGYOUS ASHRAF NAIMLATIF

Cross Defendants and Defendants

THOMAS JAMES EDWARD

MOUSA ZAKARIA ARAFAT

SERGYOUS ASHRAF NAIMLATIF

THOMAS SERVICES INC. DBA SUPERSHUTTLE

BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

MOUSA ZAKARIA ARAFAT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GERAGOS MATTHEW JAY

GERAGOS MATTHEW JAY ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BELOFSKY DAVID ARTHUR ESQ.

BELOFSKY DAVID ARTHUR

RIVER LYLE ALEX

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING...) OF 08/03/2020

8/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING...) OF 08/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING...)

8/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING...)

Order - Dismissal

8/3/2020: Order - Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA, FROM COMPLAINT

7/20/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA, FROM COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...)

6/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...) OF 06/22/2020

6/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER T...) OF 06/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND MODIFYING THE TIME FOR THE HEARING ...)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND MODIFYING THE TIME FOR THE HEARING ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND MODIFYING THE TIME FOR THE HEARING ...) OF 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND MODIFYING THE TIME FOR THE HEARING ...) OF 05/14/2020

Case Management Statement

4/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS) OF 04/07/2020

4/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS) OF 04/07/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)

4/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CASE RELATED TO BC694290); TRIAL ...)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CASE RELATED TO BC694290); TRIAL ...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA, ON 9/9/2019.

3/2/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA, ON 9/9/2019.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CASE RELATED TO BC694290); TRIAL ...)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CASE RELATED TO BC694290); TRIAL ...)

Order - ORDER COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

10/23/2019: Order - ORDER COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

10/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 10/24/2019

10/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 10/24/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/TRIAL...)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/TRIAL...)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A; Non-Jury Trial ((Related to BC694290)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A; Final Status Conference ((Related to BC694290)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding verification the complaint is at issue as to defendant James Edward Thomas) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding dismissal of defendant James Edward Thomas) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding...) of 08/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Defendant Zakaria Arafat Mousa, from Complaint); Filed by Ashraf Naimlatif Sergyous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Zakaria Arafat Mousa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:33 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Related Cases Re: BCV694290 and 19STCV17867...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Zakaria Arafat Mousa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashraf Naimlatif Sergyous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ashraf Naimlatif Sergyous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ashraf Naimlatif Sergyous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERAGOS MATTHEW J