This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 12:49:00 (UTC).

ASHOT MANUKYAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 ASHOT MANUKYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1099

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANUKYAN ASHOT

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC

TERRY YORK MOTOR CARS LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESHISHIAN ARSEN NAZAR

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/18/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/20/2021

8/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/20/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ashot Manukyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashot Manukyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ashot Manukyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TERRY YORK MOTOR CAR LTD DBA LAND ROVER ENCINO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KESHISHIAN ARSEN NAZAR