This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 03:19:25 (UTC).

ASHLEY WATSON VS UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 ASHLEY WATSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4200

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATSON ASHLEY

Defendants

TAYLOR RODNEY

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRUZEN ERIC

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS DAVID LEE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/4/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

8/4/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

7/27/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Universal Protection Service, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant); Rodney Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Universal Protection Service, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant); Rodney Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Universal Protection Service, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant); Rodney Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Universal Protection Service, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant); Rodney Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ashley Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ashley Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ashley Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashley Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRUZEN ERIC