This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 13:11:20 (UTC).

ASHLEY S. AARONS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ASHLEY S. AARONS 205 TRUST DATED MAY 15, 2015 VS ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 ASHLEY S AARONS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ASHLEY S AARONS 205 TRUST DATED MAY 15, 2015 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2747

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASHLEY S. AARONS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ASHLEY S. AARONS 205 TRUST

AARONS ASHLEY S.

Defendants

GEORGE WONG TRUSTEE OF THE GEORGE WONG RETIREMENT PLAN

ROBERT N. CLEAVES AND EMMY S. CLEAVES TRUSTEES OF THE CLEAVES FAMILY TRUST

ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS TITLE THERETO

COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH INC DBA COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH INC

RAY GOKALDAS TRUSTEE OF THE RAY GOKALDAS MD A PROFESSIONAL CORP PROFIT SHARING PLAN TRUST

HAL DRYAN TRUSTEE OF THE GEOFFREY MICHAEL DRYAN 2009 IRREVOCABLE TRUST

TAP CALIFORNIA FUND III LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ATTARAY MAINAK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO C...)

4/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO C...) OF 04/27/2020

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO C...) OF 04/27/2020

Substitution of Attorney

5/4/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Complaint

12/2/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

3/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENJOIN THE TRUSTEES SALE OF PLAINTIFFS REAL PROPERTY

12/2/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENJOIN THE TRUSTEES SALE OF PLAINTIFFS REAL PROPERTY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ASHLEY S. AARONS RE EX PARTE NOTICE ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ENJOIN THE FORECLOSURE OF HER RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY

12/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ASHLEY S. AARONS RE EX PARTE NOTICE ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ENJOIN THE FORECLOSURE OF HER RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/3/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENJOIN THE TRUSTEE'S SALE...)

12/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENJOIN THE TRUSTEE'S SALE...)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 73; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of the Summons and Complaint) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 73; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of the Summons and Complaint) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ashley S. Aarons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 86; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashley S. Aarons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Ashley S. Aarons Re Ex Parte Notice ISO Ex Parte Application for an Order to Enjoin the Foreclosure of Her Residential Property); Filed by Ashley S. Aarons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ashley S. Aarons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Enjoin the Trustee's Sale...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to enjoin the trustees sale of plaintiffs real property); Filed by Ashley S. Aarons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ATTARAY MAINAK