This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2019 at 14:02:27 (UTC).

ASHLEY MASTERTON VS NEW BOX SOLUTIONS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 ASHLEY MASTERTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NEW BOX SOLUTIONS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH R. FEFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9215

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MASTERTON ASHLEY

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Yet Classified

NEW BOX SOLUTIONS LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

MILLER DAVID

DAVIS ANTHONY

CARTER DYLAN

VASOVSKI MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SEROUSSI RUTH L.

SEROUSSI RUTH L. ESQ.

NEWHOUSE MICHAEL RAYNSFORD II

Attorney at Newhouse Law Group, PC

1800 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP

NERI GEOFFREY ALEX ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MONTES ROBERTO JR

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

NERI GEOFFREY ALEX ESQ.

MONTES ROBERTO JR

NEWHOUSE MICHAEL R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING ON CROSS- DEFENDANTS, MICHAEL VASOVSKI, ANTHONY DAVIS AND DYLAN CARTER'S DEMURRER TO CROSSCOMPLAINT OF NEW BOX SOLUTIONS, LLC AND DAVID MILLER; AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CROSS-DEFE

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON CROSS- DEFENDANTS, MICHAEL VASOVSKI, ANTHONY DAVIS AND DYLAN CARTER'S DEMURRER TO CROSSCOMPLAINT OF NEW BOX SOLUTIONS, LLC AND DAVID MILLER; AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CROSS-DEFE

Reply - Reply to Defendant Miller's Supplemental Briefing

12/14/2018: Reply - Reply to Defendant Miller's Supplemental Briefing

Separate Statement

1/3/2019: Separate Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/17/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Protective Order

12/21/2018: Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Protective Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/2/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT DAVID MILLER'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ASHLEY MASTERTON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE

9/20/2018: DEFENDANT DAVID MILLER'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ASHLEY MASTERTON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE

Notice - Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference

12/18/2018: Notice - Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference

Opposition - Opposition Plaintiff's to defendant David Miller's motion to compel further responses to requests for production of documents, set one and request for monetary sanctions against defendant

10/19/2018: Opposition - Opposition Plaintiff's to defendant David Miller's motion to compel further responses to requests for production of documents, set one and request for monetary sanctions against defendant

Answer

12/14/2018: Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/11/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

10/31/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

Answer - Answer to the First Amended Cross-Complainants New Box Solutions, Inc., and David Miller First Amended Cross-complaint

11/13/2018: Answer - Answer to the First Amended Cross-Complainants New Box Solutions, Inc., and David Miller First Amended Cross-complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/19/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT NEW BOX SOULTIONS, LLC AND DAVID MILLER'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC.

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT NEW BOX SOULTIONS, LLC AND DAVID MILLER'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC.

Summons on Cross Complaint -

7/3/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • Hearing07/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash DEFENDANT NEW BOX SOLUTIONS, LLC?S THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA FOR CONSUMER RECORDS TO CHRISTOPHER OPFELL, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Hearing04/07/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Hearing03/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Hearing01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Hearing12/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order ( To Stay Discovery Pending Settlement Efforts); Filed by Ashley Masterton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Filed by Ashley Masterton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Answer) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Status Conference (Progress in Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Progress in Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; 2. CONTRIBUTION; AND 3. DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by New Box Solutions, LLC (Defendant); David Miller (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ashley Masterton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashley Masterton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) HOSTILE WORK ENVIRONMENT HARASEMENT IN VIOLATION OF CAL.GOV. CODE 12940(J); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709215    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 37

HEARING DATE: December 5, 2019

CASE NUMBER: BC709215

CASE NAME: Ashley Masterton v. New Box Solutions, LLC, et al.

MOVING PARTY: Defendant New Box Solutions, LLC

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff Ashley Masterton

TRIAL DATE: April 7, 2020

PROOF OF SERVICE: OK

PROCEEDING: Defendant’s Motion for Sanctions and To Compel Compliance

OPPOSITION: December 2, 2019--untimely

REPLY: None (as of 12/3/19)

TENTATIVE: Defendant’s Motion for Sanctions and to Compel Compliance is CONTINUED 60 days.

The parties stipulated and the court ordered a stay on discovery deadlines on November 27, 2019. Accordingly, this motion is continued to February 4, 2020. All papers shall be filed in accordance with the CCP based on that date.