This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 10:55:42 (UTC).

ASHLEY MARIA MEJIA VS DOIN ALEXANDER MEJIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 ASHLEY MARIA MEJIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOIN ALEXANDER MEJIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4406

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA ASHLEY MARIA

Defendants

KIROVSKY GENNADY

MAJOR HOME APPLIANCE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MEJIA DOIN ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASATRYAN MHER

Defendant Attorney

SMITH FRED B.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/28/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/28/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/28/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/20/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/20/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/10/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2024
  • Hearing07/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2024
  • Hearing01/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2024
  • Hearing01/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Doin Alexander Mejia (Defendant); Gennady Kirovsky (Defendant); As to: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Doin Alexander Mejia (Defendant); Gennady Kirovsky (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Doin Alexander Mejia (Defendant); Service Date: 08/10/2022; Service Cost: 525.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Doin Alexander Mejia (Defendant); Gennady Kirovsky (Defendant); Service Date: 08/10/2022; Service Cost: 350.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Major Home Appliance, a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/10/2022; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Doin Alexander Mejia (Defendant); Gennady Kirovsky (Defendant); Major Home Appliance, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Doin Alexander Mejia (Defendant); Gennady Kirovsky (Defendant); Major Home Appliance, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ashley Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: Doin Alexander Mejia (Defendant); Gennady Kirovsky (Defendant); Major Home Appliance, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less