This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 07:52:41 (UTC).

ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS JAYLA BRANNON, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAYLA BRANNON, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7223

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA AN INDIVIDUAL ASHLEY HERBERT

Defendants

SMITH AN INDIVIDUAL JULIE

BRANNON AN INDIVIDUAL JAYLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALDER MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

AYOUB ROSALINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

3/29/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

3/29/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Settlement

5/12/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/13/2021

5/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

1/12/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/10/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:25 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAYLA BRANNON, an individual (Defendant); JULIE SMITH, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JAYLA BRANNON, an individual (Defendant); JULIE SMITH, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by JAYLA BRANNON, an individual (Defendant); JULIE SMITH, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ASHLEY HERBERT CABRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less