This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2020 at 08:20:19 (UTC).

ASHLEY FOX VS KOOK BAE KIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 ASHLEY FOX filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KOOK BAE KIM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6184

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOX ASHLEY

Defendants

KIM CHONG YOL AKA SEAN KIM

KIM KOOK BAE AKA SEAN KIM

PRIME USA

NEW BEVERLY HILLS ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABOL CRISTOPHER G

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/26/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/26/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 08:45 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 08:45 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ashley Fox (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashley Fox (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ashley Fox (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW BEVERLY HILLS ASSOCIATES CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABOL CRISTOPHER G.