This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 01:11:15 (UTC).

ASHLEY DAWSON VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 ASHLEY DAWSON filed an Other lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9917

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DAWSON ASHLEY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 30

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPOR-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW L.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEVY & NOURAFCHAN LLP

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/20/2018: Unknown

MINUTE ORDER

3/5/2018: MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order

3/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE COURT'S REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO PERSONAL INJURY COURT, DEPARTMENT 92

3/22/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE COURT'S REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO PERSONAL INJURY COURT, DEPARTMENT 92

Minute Order

4/24/2018: Minute Order

Notice

10/16/2018: Notice

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/8/2017: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/18/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

11/1/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/16/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Stipulation and Order ([PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)); Filed by Ashley Dawson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Notice (of Posting Jury Fees by LA County MTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 3; (Transfer-Incoming; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE COURT'S REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO PERSONAL INJURY COURT, DEPARTMENT 92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Ashley Dawson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 1; (Order ReReassignment of Case; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Ashley Dawson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ashley Dawson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Ashley Dawson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC679917    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ASHLEY DAWSON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC679917

[TENTATIVE] ORDER

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 21, 2019

Plaintiff’s attorney seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending a breakdown in communication renders continued representation impossible. Counsel declares he confirmed Plaintiff’s address via a Westlaw Public Records Search. The Court wishes to hear from Counsel, at the time of the hearing, concerning exactly what search was conducted and what it revealed. The Court is not, at this time, satisfied that a Westlaw Public Records Search guarantees a person’s address is current.

If Counsel appears and satisfies the Court that the address is current, the motion will be granted. If Counsel fails to do so, the motion will be denied without prejudice.

The Court notes that the proof of service of the moving papers shows Counsel served the papers via certified mail. If Counsel has a certified mail return receipt signed by Plaintiff, the Court will be satisfied that service of the moving papers was sufficient and Plaintiff’s address was confirmed.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.