This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 06:00:05 (UTC).

ASHLEY CASTILLO, ET AL. VS JORGE CARPIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 ASHLEY CASTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JORGE CARPIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, EDWARD B. MORETON and CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8580

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

EDWARD B. MORETON

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA JANELLY

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CARPIO GUSTAVO

CARPIO JONATHAN

CARPIO JORGE

Cross Defendant

CASTILLO-FLORES LEONARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORENFELD DAVID K

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BARATTA JAMES M.

AVAKIAN ARMEN ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL) OF 03/16/2021

3/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL) OF 03/16/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL) OF 03/23/2021

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL) OF 03/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT JORGE CARPIOS DEMURRER

1/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT JORGE CARPIOS DEMURRER

Answer

1/15/2021: Answer

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO DISMISS BATTERY AND ASSAULT CASUSES OF ACTION AGAINST JORGE CARPIO

1/15/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO DISMISS BATTERY AND ASSAULT CASUSES OF ACTION AGAINST JORGE CARPIO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

1/4/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Cross-Complaint

12/14/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

12/14/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Hearing07/13/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by Gustavo Carpio (Defendant); Jonathan Carpio (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan Carpio (Cross-Complainant); Gustavo Carpio (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketORDER RE STIPULATION TO DISMISS BATTERY AND ASSAULT CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT JORGE CARPIO AND TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS AGAINST DEFENDANT JORGE CARPIO; Filed by Jorge Carpio (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff); Janelly Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:19 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to a Recusal) of 03/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff); Janelly Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff); Janelly Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Ashley); Filed by Ashley Castillo (Plaintiff); Janelly Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DORENFELD DAVID K.