This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2023 at 11:56:53 (UTC).

ASHLEY BAESEMAN VS BEVERLY HILLS AESTHETIC SURGICAL INSTITUTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 ASHLEY BAESEMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS AESTHETIC SURGICAL INSTITUTE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0412

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAESEMAN ASHLEY

Defendants

BEVERLY HILLS AESTHETIC SURGICAL INSTITUTE

SAADAT M.D. DARYOUSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNCH BRUCE M.

Defendant Attorney

LYNCH GREGORY G.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

1/6/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/6/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/5/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

12/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/04/2022

11/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/04/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/26/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/26/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REASSIGNMENT OF MATTER TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE GAIL KILLEFER, DEPT. 37

7/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REASSIGNMENT OF MATTER TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE GAIL KILLEFER, DEPT. 37

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/23/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 06/27/2022

6/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 06/27/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

6/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

6/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Beverly Hills Aesthetic Surgical Institute (Defendant); As to: Ashley Baeseman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Beverly Hills Aesthetic Surgical Institute (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Further Case Management Conference; Filed by: Ashley Baeseman (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY G. LYNCH (Attorney); Beverly Hills Aesthetic Surgical Institute (Defendant); Daryoush Saadat M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/06/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Beverly Hills Aesthetic Surgical Institute (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Ashley Baeseman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Management Conference and Reassignment: Name Extension changed from OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REASSIGNMENT OF MATTER TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE GAIL KILLEFER, DEPT. 37 to of Case Management Conference and Reassignment ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Ashley Baeseman (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Malcolm Mackey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ashley Baeseman (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Hills Aesthetic Surgical Institute (Defendant); Daryoush Saadat M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ashley Baeseman (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Hills Aesthetic Surgical Institute (Defendant); Daryoush Saadat M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ashley Baeseman (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Hills Aesthetic Surgical Institute (Defendant); Daryoush Saadat M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less