This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 04:04:44 (UTC).

ASHLEY ABRAMS VS ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 ASHLEY ABRAMS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8399

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABRAMS ASHLEY

Defendant

ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JIVALAGIAN CASPAR

ADAMS CHRISTOPHER A

Defendant Attorneys

FREUDENBERGER TIMOTHY MARK

COLE BRIAN ERIC II

LUBRANO NANCY NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL

10/7/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

9/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 09/28/2020

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 09/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

8/12/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY, INC.'S NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL

6/29/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY, INC.'S NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 07/28/2020

7/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 07/28/2020

Initial Status Conference Order

6/15/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 06/15/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 06/15/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

6/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Answer

6/19/2020: Answer

Answer - DEFENDANT ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ASHLEY ABRAMS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/22/2020: Answer - DEFENDANT ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ASHLEY ABRAMS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling re Non-Appearance Case Review re Status of Removal; Filed by Acts-Aviation Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Status of Removal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Status of Removal) of 09/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Status of Removal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Status of Removed Case); Filed by Acts-Aviation Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court); Filed by Acts-Aviation Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:31 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 07/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketDefendant Acts-Aviation Security, INC.'s Answer to Plaintiff Ashley Abrams' Unverified complaint; Filed by Acts-Aviation Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant ACTS-Aviation Security, Inc. to Plaintiff Ashley Abrams' Unverified Complaint); Filed by Acts-Aviation Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docketat 2:02 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of 06/15/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ashley Abrams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ashley Abrams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACTS-AVIATION SECURITY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBRANO NANCY NICOLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE BRIAN ERIC II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREUDENBERGER TIMOTHY MARK