This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 00:49:37 (UTC).

ASHEESH DANEE VS GEORGE WEDANARACHCHI

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 ASHEESH DANEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEORGE WEDANARACHCHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICIA D. NIETO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8807

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PATRICIA D. NIETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANEE ASHEESH

Defendant

WEDANARACHCHI GEORGE

Other

VENTURA CO. SUPERIOR COURT-UNLIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

DENOVE JOHN F. ESQ.

CHEONG DENOVE ROWELL & BENNETT ALPC

Defendant Attorney

ADY LAW GROUP P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS ;ETC

1/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS ;ETC

SUMMONS

1/5/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/2/2018: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/18/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/21/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF CASE TRANSFER

5/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE TRANSFER

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO VENTURA COUNTY

5/2/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO VENTURA COUNTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Asheesh Danee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Transfer; Filed by Asheesh Danee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2; Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Asheesh Danee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by George Wedanarachchi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Asheesh Danee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Asheesh Danee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

John F. Denove, CSB #68825

Onik R. Ovanesian, CSB #316986 ' CHEONG, DENOVE, ROWELL & BENNETT A Law Partnership including Professional Corporations 1925 Century Park East, Suite 800

Los Angeles, California 90067

(310) 277-4857 Fax No.: (310) 277-5254

Attorneys for Plaintiff, Asheesh Danee

- CGlorietta Kedalis 0

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

ASHEESH DANEE, caseno, BC6 88807 Plaintiff, | ' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; V. | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL GEORGE WEDANARACHCHI; and DOES | 1. Intentional Infliction of 1 through 50, inclusive, Emotional Distress

2. Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress Defendants. 3. Stalking (Civil Code §1708.7)

(DAMAGES EXCEED $25,000)

Plaintiff, ASHEESH DANEE, alleges: 1. At all times herein mentioned, plaintiff ASHEESH DANEE is an

individual residing in Los Angeles County, State of California.

2. All acts complained of herein took place within the jurisdiction of the above-captioned court.

3. Plaintiff is presently unaware of the true names and capacities of the Defendants issued herein as DOES 1 through 50, inclusive, and therefore sues said Defendants by fictitious names. When the true names and capacities of said Defendants

are ascertained, Plaintiff will amend this Complaint accordingly. Plaintiff is informed

- T » AR

. Ceothoowé1 3 ‘ EL'- . ar o - e »

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ventura Superior Court is a litigant