Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 04:00:55 (UTC).

ASENCION, MAYRA ALEJANDRA VS PALMA, ELVIN EDILMER

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 ASENCION, MAYRA ALEJANDRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PALMA, ELVIN EDILMER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1237

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASENCION MAYRA ALEJANDRA

Respondent

PALMA ELVIN EDILMER

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/19/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

9/19/2019: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Summons

9/19/2019: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

9/19/2019: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/19/2019: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - UCCJEA

9/19/2019: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Separate Property

9/19/2019: Declaration - Separate Property

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/19/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Case Assignment

9/19/2019: Notice - Case Assignment

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

9/19/2019: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

11/8/2019: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

Proof of Service of Summons - Personal - Service Time Incomplete

11/8/2019: Proof of Service of Summons - Personal - Service Time Incomplete

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

11/8/2019: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

Judgment Package Received - Stipulated

11/22/2019: Judgment Package Received - Stipulated

Proof of Service of Summons - Personal

11/22/2019: Proof of Service of Summons - Personal

Request - Enter Default FL165

11/26/2019: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Default FL170

12/11/2019: Declaration - Default FL170

Notice - Entry of Judgment

12/31/2019: Notice - Entry of Judgment

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (approved 12/27/2019 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Personal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Personal - Service Time Incomplete ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less